IL HB3088 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the State Agency and Grantee Bonus Prohibition Act. Provides that no State agency or hospital shall pay from State funds, in whole or in part, and no employee of a State agency or hospital may receive a bonus as all or part of his or her compensation, including such bonuses as may be received for work on capital projects. Provides that no grantee shall pay and no employee or contract worker of a grantee may receive a bonus paid from grant funds awarded for operational expenses as all or part of his or her compensation, including such bonuses as may be received for work on capital projects. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE AGENCY BONUS PROHIBITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2020-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2020-03-12 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2019-03-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-009-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |