IL HB3085 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections and the Department of Juvenile Justice shall require their correctional officers to undergo mental health screenings and tests and shall develop rules to monitor and track their interaction with committed persons and to provide for discharge or other assignments for officers who are mentally unable to interact with committed persons. Defines "correctional officer".
Title
CD CORR-CORRECTIONAL OFFICER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3085&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3085.htm |