IL HB3085 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that notice to parties in a contested case under the Act shall be served, among other forms of service, by electronic mail. Provides that parties in a contested case under the Act shall be notified, among other forms of notification, by electronic mail of any decision or order in that case. Provides that an agency may require all attorneys to designate an electronic mail address to which all documents required under certain specified Sections may be transmitted. Provides that if an attorney is required to designate an electronic mail address, he or she must designate one primary electronic mail address, and may designate no more than 2 secondary electronic mail addresses. Provides that an agency may request, but not require, an unrepresented party to designate an electronic mail address to which all documents required under certain specified Sections may be transmitted. Allows an agency to, by rule, make electronic mail the default option for service of documents. Provides that service by electronic mail is complete on the first business day following transmission.
Title
ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE-EMAIL
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Government Transparency Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Government Transparency Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 10-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 10-75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3085&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3085.htm |