IL HB3083 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Fiscal Note Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Repeals a Section requiring instruction in all public elementary and secondary schools to be in the English language. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-INSTRUCTION IN ENGLISH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-005-000
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-2Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback