IL HB3080 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Beginning July 1, 2017, increases the amount of employment as a teacher that a retired teacher may perform without impairing retirement status; allows 130 paid days or 700 paid hours in a school year. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-TRS-RETURN TO SERVICE
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-05 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-003-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 16-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |