IL HB3065 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act. Provides that the director of procurement and materials management or board of commissioners (rather than only the director) may determine the responsibility of a bidder or reject a bid. Provides additional factors that may be used in determining the responsibility of a bidder. Provides that all bidders must adhere to the project labor agreement, when applicable, including all contractors regardless of whether the bidder will self-perform or not.
Title
MWRD-COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | To Water Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2605 | 11.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2605 | 11.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3065&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3065.htm |