IL HB3060 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vital Records Act. Provides that specified fees for birth record searches or certified copies of birth records shall be waived for all requests made by a homeless person whose status is verified by specified human services, legal services, or other similar agencies. Provides that individuals who are homeless must not be charged for this verification. Provides that the State Registrar of Vital Records shall establish standards and procedures for birth record search waivers for homeless persons that shall include a record of specified information. Provides that any falsification of this official record is subject to penalty. Defines "homeless person". Effective immediately.
Title
BIRTH RECORDS-HOMELESS PERSONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0506 |
2017-09-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-09-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-06-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-25 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-25 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 091-005-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-012-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 535 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 535 | 25.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |