IL HB3053 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Authorized Electronic Monitoring in Long-Term Care Facilities Act. Changes the title of the Act to the Authorized Electronic Monitoring in Long-Term Care Facilities and Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Act. Makes changes to make the provisions of the Act applicable to community-integrated living arrangements certified under the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that the term "Department", for the purposes of facilities licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act, ID/DD Community Care Act, or MC/DD Act, means the Department of Public Health. Provides that the term "Department", for the purposes of community-integrated living arrangements certified under the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act, means the Department of Human Services. Adds community-integrated living arrangements to the definition of "facility". Provides that "resident's representative" does not apply to community-integrated living arrangements. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall consult with the Department of Public Health when adopting rules to implement the Act. Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act to make conforming changes. Provides that it is a business offense for a person to discriminate or retaliate against a resident for consenting to the electronic monitoring, or to prevent the installation or use of an electronic monitoring device by a resident that has provided specified notice and consent. Makes other changes.
Title
AUTHORIZED ELECTRONIC MONITOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 135 | 14.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 32 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 32 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 32 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3053&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3053.htm |