IL HB3045 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that an application for a certificate of title, vehicle registration, and license or instruction permit shall include, if available, a person's email address. Provides that in preparation for selection of random samples for verification of a liability insurance policy, the Secretary of State may send to owners of randomly selected motor vehicles requests for information about their motor vehicles and liability insurance coverage electronically or, if electronic means are unavailable, via U.S. mail.
Title
VEH CD-SOS-EMAIL NOTIFICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0145 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |