IL HB3042 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Adds 3 synthetic cannabinoids to the list of Schedule I substances. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES-SCHED I

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0194
2011-07-22HouseEffective Date July 22, 2011
2011-07-22HouseGovernor Approved
2011-06-24HouseSent to the Governor
2011-05-28HousePassed Both Houses
2011-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-000
2011-05-27HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2011-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2011-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2011-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2011-05-18HouseArrived in House
2011-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2011-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2011-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2011-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2011-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2011
2011-05-13SenateSecond Reading
2011-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011
2011-05-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 005-000-000
2011-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2011-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
2011-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues
2011-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2011-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2011-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2011-05-04SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2011-04-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2011-04-07SenateFirst Reading
2011-04-07SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2011-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2011
2011-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2011-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2011-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay
2011-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2011-03-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2011-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2011-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2011-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2011-02-28HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2011-02-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2011-02-23HouseFirst Reading
2011-02-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720570204Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback