IL HB3025 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Peace Officer Motor Vehicle Pursuit Act. Provides that a peace officer is authorized to initiate a motor vehicle pursuit when the officer is able to articulate a reason to believe the occupant of a fleeing vehicle: (1) has committed or attempted to commit a forcible felony involving the infliction or threatened infliction of great bodily harm; (2) is attempting to escape by use of a deadly weapon or an object or device that the peace officer reasonably believes to be a deadly weapon; (3) otherwise indicates he or she will endanger human life or inflict great bodily harm unless apprehended immediately; or (4) is or has committed the offense of aggravated fleeing or attempting to elude a peace officer. Provides that a peace officer engaged in a motor vehicle pursuit shall activate both the rotating or flashing lights and the siren of his or her police vehicle. Provides that a peace officer who is driving a police vehicle equipped with a video camera shall ensure the camera is activated at all times while engaged in a pursuit or fleeing and eluding incident. Provides for police officer pursuit training. Preempts home rule. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Illinois Police Training Act to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
PEACE OFFICER MOTOR-PURSUIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-98 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 705 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3025&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3025.htm |