IL HB3023 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes it unlawful for a child sex offender to knowingly be present in or loiter on a public way within 500 feet of any publicly accessible privately owned building with playground or recreation facilities or on real property comprising any publicly accessible privately owned building with playground or recreation facilities. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony.
Title
CHILD SEX OFFENDER-PLAYGROUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0266 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 013-000-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary; 002-000-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-9.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |