IL HB3021 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates an alternate valuation for certain property in the City of Harvard that meets the criteria to be certified as revitalized property for advanced technology.
Title
PROP TX-TECHNOLOGY PROPERTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3021&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3021.htm |