IL HB3019 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person is guilty of aggravated driving under the influence (a Class 4 felony) if the person, in committing a violation of provisions prohibiting the operation of a motor vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs, was involved in a motor vehicle accident that resulted in the severe injury or death of a police animal, service animal, accelerant detection dog, or search and rescue dog.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD–DUI-SERVICE ANIMAL HARM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-05SenateTo Criminal Law- Clear Compliance
2021-05-04SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-04-29SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John F. Curran
2021-04-26SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-04-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-22SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-22SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-21HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2021-04-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
2021-04-15HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2021-04-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-026-002
2021-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2021-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
2021-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-501Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback