IL HB3014 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall rename the Ethnic Village exhibit at the Illinois State Fair to the Village of Cultures.
Title
AGR-VILLAGE OF CULTURES
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0216 |
2019-08-07 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-07 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |