IL HB3013 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the amount of credit that exceeds the taxpayer's liability shall be refunded if the taxpayer is 65 years or older and has a federal adjusted gross income of not more than $50,000. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-EITC AND PROP TX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355208Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback