IL HB3012 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Allows a specified school district to make a one-time transfer of certain excess funds to the Operations and Maintenance Fund of the district by proper resolution and following a public hearing. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-FUND TRANSFERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0032 |
2017-08-04 | House | Effective Date August 4, 2017 |
2017-08-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-030-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 17-2A | Amended Code | Citation Text |