IL HB3005 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Deposit of State Moneys Act. Provides that the State Treasurer may, with the approval of the Governor, invest or reinvest (regardless of whether the price exceeds par) any State money in the treasury that is not needed for current expenditures due or about to become due, or any money in the State Treasury that has been set aside and held for the payment of the principal of and interest on any State bonds, in bonds issued by counties or municipal corporations of this State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEPOSIT STATE MONEY-INVESTMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 074-023-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 005-000-000
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-048-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-001-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-15HouseRe-assigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1552022.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3005&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3005.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3005eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3005enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3005ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3005ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3005sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3005_04052017_029000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB3005_05262017_038000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3005_06252017_014000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback