IL HB3004 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0603
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0603
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that no individual who is a board member of a pension fund, investment board, or retirement system may be employed by that pension fund, investment board, or retirement system at any time during his or her service and for a period of 12 months after he or she ceases to be a board member. Provides an exception if a senior administrative staff position becomes vacant and no executive member of the staff is willing to accept the position. In that situation, provides that an individual serving as a board member may temporarily serve as an interim member of the senior administrative staff of the fund if certain conditions are met.
Title
PEN CD-BOARD MEMBER EMPLOYMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Jason Barickman [R] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0603 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2021-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Connor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 006-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-109.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-109.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |