IL HB3004 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Governor Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that the Authority may issue, sell, and deliver additional Working Cash Notes before July 1, 2020 (now July 1, 2018) that are over and above and in addition to the $100,000,000 authorization. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RTA-ISSUANCE OF BONDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Amendatory Veto
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-011-000
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2017
2017-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-004-000
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-18SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 060-056-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-27HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Mass Transit Committee; 007-005-000
2017-04-04HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mass Transit Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mass Transit Committee; 009-001-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mass Transit Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mass Transit Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Mass Transit Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7036154.04Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback