IL HB2998 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a teacher who served as a teacher during the public health emergency declared by the Governor related to the COVID-19 pandemic shall receive one additional day of service credit for each day of service credit earned during that period, notwithstanding any limitation on the amount of service credit that may be earned in a single year. Provides that the service credit shall be granted without any additional employee or employer contribution. Provides that any benefit increase that results from the amendatory Act is excluded from the definition of "new benefit increase". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-TRS-SERVICE CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40516-128.5New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback