IL HB2997 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Provisions and Downstate Teacher Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a teacher may establish one additional day of service credit for each day of service credit that was earned between March 16, 2020 and June 30, 2021 in which the teacher provided in-person instruction if he or she pays certain contributions and supplies satisfactory evidence. For a Tier 1 member, provides that the System shall waive the reduction in retirement annuity for persons who retire before age 60 if the member has attained age 59 and earned service credit in the 2020-2021 school. For a Tier 2 member, provides that the reduction in retirement annuity for persons who retire before age 67 shall be waived if the member has attained age 66 and earned service credit in the 2020-2021 school year. For a Tier 1 member who earned service credit in the 2020-2021 school year and has not attained age 59 or a Tier 2 member who earned service credit in the 2020-2021 school year and has not attained age 66, provides that the member shall be deemed to be one year older than his or her actual age for purposes of provisions concerning a reduction in retirement annuity due to a member's age. Provides that any benefit increase that results from the amendatory Act is excluded from the definition of "new benefit increase". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-TRS-AGE&SERVICE CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2021-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-160Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-127Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-133Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback