IL HB2995 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions and Departments of State Government law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Repeals the Agricultural Export Advisory Committee. Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 to make a conforming change. Effective immediately.
Title
AG EXPORT ADVISORY CMTE REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0110 |
2017-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2017 |
2017-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 205 | 205-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 205 | 40.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-530 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
230 | 5 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |