IL HB2976 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires every institution of higher education approved by the Illinois Student Assistance Commission, whether public or private, to submit an annual report on its voluntary supplier diversity program to the Department of Central Management Services, except that, in the case of public community colleges, requires the report to be submitted to the Illinois Community College Board and requires the Illinois Community College Board to immediately forward the report to the Department. Sets forth provisions on what the report must include and how and when the report must be submitted. Provides that, for each report, the Department shall publish the results on its Internet website for 5 years after submission or, with respect to public community colleges, for 5 years after the report has been forwarded to the Department by the Illinois Community College Board. Requires the Department to hold an annual higher education supplier diversity workshop in February of 2018 and every February thereafter to discuss the reports with representatives of the institutions of higher education and vendors. Provides that the Department shall prepare a template for voluntary supplier diversity reports. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED SUPPLIER DIVERSITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-04-24SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-012-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20405405-530New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback