IL HB2974 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that 30 days prior to the issuance of a building permit for a facility necessitating the erection of a new tower, the permit applicant shall provide written notice of its intent to construct the facility to the owners of record of all residential property that is adjacent to the lot where the facility is proposed to be sited. Sets forth requirements for the notice. Further provides that nothing in the published notice sent to the owners shall contain any material that appears to be an advertisement for the telecommunications carrier or any services provided by that carrier. Effective immediately.
Title
CNTY CD-TELECOM FACILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0496 |
2011-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2011 |
2011-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 106-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ren |
2011-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2011-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Holmes |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2011 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzi Schmidt |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2011-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ren |
2011-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ren |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ren |