IL HB2969 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends language in the Illinois Securities Law of 1953 providing that the 3-year period for seeking specified relief under the Act begins to run on the earlier of the date the party bringing the action has actual knowledge of the alleged violation or the date the party bringing the action has notice of facts which in the exercise of reasonable diligence would lead to actual knowledge of the alleged violation. Deletes language providing that the period of limitation may not be extended more than 2 years beyond the expiration of the 3-year period. Effective immediately.
Title
SECURITIES SUIT TIME LIMIT
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0174 |
2013-08-05 | House | Effective Date August 5, 2013 |
2013-08-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-007-000 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-021-001 |
2013-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 018-002-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |