IL HB2966 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-08 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-08 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that a business that intends to establish a new utility-scale solar power facility may apply for a high impact business designation. Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Increases the long-term renewable procurement plan goals after the 2025 delivery year. Requires the long-term renewable procurement plan to include the procurement of new renewable energy credits. Provides that the Adjustable Block program shall be designed to be continuously open. Authorizes utilities to recover certain costs related to the Adjustable Block program. Excludes certain costs from a limitation on the costs of the Adjustable Block program. Makes other changes concerning the Adjustable Block program. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Requires the Illinois Commerce Commission to open a proceeding to update the interconnection standards and applicable utility tariffs. Requires the Commission to revise certain standards for interconnection based on specified criteria. Establishes an interconnection working group. Makes changes to provisions concerning net metering and the distributed generation rebate. Requires the Commission, in consultation with the Illinois Power Agency, to study and produce a report analyzing the potential for and barriers to the implementation of energy storage in Illinois. Requires the Agency to include a plan to procure energy from energy storage resources as part of its procurement plan for 2021. Extends a provision concerning a review, reconciliation, and true-up associated with renewable energy resources' collections and costs. Makes other changes. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to authorize emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
RENEWABLE ENERGY-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-04 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2020-01-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-012-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 655 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2966&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2966.htm |