IL HB2958 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that, on and after January 1, 2018, no person may knowingly cause or allow sale at wholesale or retail of a coal tar sealant product. Provides that, on and after July 1, 2019, no person may knowingly cause or allow application of a coal tar sealant product on any surface, except for highway structures, in the State of Illinois including but not limited to a driveway, parking area, playground, sidewalk, bike trail or roadway. Provides that a city or county may adopt ordinances providing for enforcement of the requirements of this provision. Provides that any violation of this provision shall be enforceable by administrative citation. Provides that penalties for violation may not exceed $1,000 for the first offense and $5,000 for the second offense. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-COAL TAR BAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000
2017-03-21HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-14HouseRemains in Consumer Protection Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-07HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415552.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback