IL HB2949 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0438
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0438
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Asthma Inhalers at Recreational Camps Act. Changes the name of the Act to the Emergency Asthma Inhalers and Allergy Treatment for Children Act. Defines "after-school care program". Requires an after-school care program to permit a child with severe, potentially life-threatening allergies to possess, self-administer, and use an epinephrine auto-injector or inhaler, if the certain conditions are satisfied. Allows after-school care program personnel: who have completed an anaphylaxis training program to administer an undesignated epinephrine injection to any child if the after-school care program personnel believe in good faith that the child is having an anaphylactic reaction while in the after-school care program; to carry undesignated epinephrine injectors on their person while in the after-school care program; to administer undesignated asthma medication to any child if the after-school care program personnel believe in good faith that the child is experiencing respiratory distress while in the after-school care program; and to carry undesignated asthma medication on their person while in the after-school care program. Provides that if after-school care program personnel administer an undesignated epinephrine injection to a person and the after-school care program personnel believe in good faith the person is having an anaphylactic reaction or administer undesignated asthma medication to a person and believe in good faith the person is experiencing respiratory distress, then the after-school care program and its employees and agents shall not incur any liability or be subject to professional discipline, except for willful and wanton conduct, as a result of any injury arising from the use of the injection or medication, notwithstanding whether notice was given to or authorization was given by the child's parent or guardian or by the child's physician, physician assistant, or advanced practice registered nurse and notwithstanding the absence of the parent's or guardian's signed statement acknowledging release from liability. Makes other and conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE COMPTROLLER-STATE FAIR
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass [D] | Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D] | Rep. Laura Faver Dias [D] |
Rep. Maura Hirschauer [D] | Rep. Mary Canty [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0438 |
2023-08-04 | House | Effective Date August 4, 2023 |
2023-08-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-26 | House | House Concurs |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000 |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 405 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |