IL HB2949 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school board shall require that schools provide daily recess for all students in kindergarten through grade 5. Provides that the recess must be at least 20 minutes in length. Provides that recess shall include unstructured play and may include organized games. Provides that if the principal determines that the weather is inclement, then the principal shall direct that recess be held indoors. Provides that a school board may require that schools provide daily recess for all students in grades 6 through 8. Requires a school board to prohibit the withholding of recess as a disciplinary action. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
SCH CD-RECESS REQUIRED
Sponsors
Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-006-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-22 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 008-009-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |