IL HB2939 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Campus Free Speech Act. Requires the governing board of each public university and community college to develop and adopt a policy on free expression; sets forth what the policy must contain. Requires the Board of Higher Education to create a Committee on Free Expression to issue an annual report. Requires public institutions of higher education to include in their freshman orientation programs a section describing to all students the policies and rules regarding free expression that are consistent with the Act. Contains provisions concerning rules, construction of the Act, permitted restrictions, and enforcement.
Title
CAMPUS FREE SPEECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-03-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-03-09 | House | To Higher Education Analysis Subcommittee |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |