IL HB2934 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Motion Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that nothing in the Act prohibits a licensee from carrying a firearm into an Interstate highway rest area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY-REST AREA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HouseMotion Tabled
2017-05-30HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-30HouseMotion Discharge Committee Tabled
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-15HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306665Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback