IL HB2932 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-26)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-26)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Flag Display Act. Requires the Governor to issue an official notice to fly the United States national flag, the State flag of Illinois, and the appropriate military flag upon the death of a resident of this State killed during on duty training for active military duty.
Title
FLAG DISPLAY-ON DUTY TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0372 |
2015-08-17 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2015-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 019-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 465 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |