IL HB2931 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Creates tax increment allocation financing extensions for ordinances adopted: (i) on May 19, 1997 by the Village of Swansea; (ii) on August 13, 2001 by the Village of Saunemin; (iii) on January 10, 2005 by the Village of Romeoville; (iv) on January 28, 1997 by the City of Berwyn for the South Berwyn Corridor Tax Increment Financing District and for the Roosevelt Road Tax Increment Financing District; and (v) on May 3, 2001 by the Village of Hanover Park for the Village Center Tax Increment Financing Redevelopment Project Area (TIF # 3). Effective immediately.
Title
TIF-VILLAGE OF PHOENIX
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0274 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 103-009-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 4 |
2019-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-002-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Harris |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-001-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-007-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2019-03-21 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |