IL HB2919 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides if the court is of the opinion that the defendant will appear as required either before or after conviction and the defendant will not pose a danger to any person or the community and that the defendant will comply with all conditions of bond the defendant must be released on his or her recognizance (rather than may be released on his or her recognizance). Requires the court to consider several release factors in reaching its opinion on release of the defendant on his or her recognizance and before considering monetary bail.
Title
CRIM PRO - BAIL RECOGNIZANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-30 | House | House Non-Concurs |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 28, 2015 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-047-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |