IL HB2909 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision limiting medical assistance recipients to one pair of adult eyeglasses every 2 years, provides that the limitation does not apply to an individual who needs different eyeglasses following a surgical procedure such as cataract surgery. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-EYEGLASSES-SURGERY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-03-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5fAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback