IL HB2907 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-13)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning access to psychiatric mental health services via telepsychiatry, provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall not require that a physician or other licensed health care professional be physically present in the same room as the patient for the entire time during which the patient is receiving telepsychiatry services. Provides that the Department shall not require that a physician or other licensed healthcare professional be physically present in the same room as the patient for the entire time during which the patient is receiving telemedicine services. Defines "telemedicine" as the use of a telecommunication system to provide medical services for the purpose of evaluation and treatment when the patient is at one location and the rendering provider is at another location.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-TELEMEDICINE-REQUIRMNTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0385
2017-08-25HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 008-000-000
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.25Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5.25aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback