IL HB2897 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Helping Paws Service Dog Program shall include training service dogs for veterans with post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) or depression. Defines "veteran".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-HELPING PAWS-VETERANS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2017-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-12-16Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback