IL HB2896 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Provides that the definition of "renewable energy resources" includes synthetic gas created by the plasma gasification of waste, densified fuel pellets made from waste material that does not include materials resulting from the handling, processing, storage, and consumption of food, and fuel produced by pyrolysis of organic or waste material from a municipality. Effective immediately.
Title
POWER AGENCY-RENEWABLE ENERGY
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Winters [R] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2012 |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-004-000 |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2012-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - Energy |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2011 |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 024-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 024-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 024-000-000 |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |