IL HB2893 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Veterans' Home in Quincy Foundation Act. Authorizes the Secretary of State to create the Illinois Veterans' Home in Quincy Foundation. Provides further requirements concerning the establishment of the Foundation. Provides for officers of the Foundation. Provides that funds collected by the Foundation shall be used for private partnership projects that will support renovations to the Illinois Veterans Home in Quincy campus, Dudley House, and domiciliary buildings. Provides further requirements concerning Foundation funds. Provides for the adoption of rules. Provides purpose provisions.
Title
QUINCY VETERAN HOME FOUNDATION
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Frese [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2893&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2893.htm |