IL HB2893 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that any person may use a crossbow to take wildlife during the appropriate archery season. Repeals crossbow provisions limiting the use of crossbows to specified conditions, together with a related definition. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CROSSBOW HUNTING-ARCHERY SEAS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 29 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-08HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0489
2017-09-08HouseEffective Date September 8, 2017
2017-09-08HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 081-014-001
2017-06-21HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-31HouseArrived in House
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-003-000
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bivins
2017-05-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-26SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-029-004
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2893&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2893.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2893eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2893enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0489.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2893ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2893ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2893sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2893_04052017_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2893_05312017_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2893_06252017_011000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback