IL HB2891 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975. Defines "dismemberment abortion". Provides that no person shall perform, or attempt to perform, a dismemberment abortion on an unborn child unless: (1) the dismemberment abortion is necessary to preserve the life of the pregnant woman; or (2) a continuation of the pregnancy will cause a substantial and irreversible physical impairment of a major bodily function of the pregnant woman. Provides that no woman upon whom an abortion is performed or attempted to be performed shall be criminally or civilly liable for performing or attempting to perform a dismemberment abortion. Provides that no nurse, technician, secretary, receptionist, or other employee or agent who is not a physician, but who acts at the direction of a physician, and no pharmacist or other individual who is not a physician, but who fills a prescription or provides instruments or materials used in an abortion at the direction of or to a physician shall be criminally or civilly liable for performing or attempting to perform a dismemberment abortion.
Title
ABORTION LAW-DISMEMBERMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To Informed Consent Subcommitee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 510 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 510 | 3.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2891&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2891.htm |