IL HB2863 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that bids for State or federally funded road construction contracts shall include transportation costs itemized apart from the cost of the goods or materials transported.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROAD CONSTRUCTION BIDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-14HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-14HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-03-09HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-09HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 006-005-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62554-103.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback