IL HB2860 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the portion of a site or facility that collects, separates, stores, or converts post-use polymers into crude oil, fuels, or other valuable final or intermediate products using a pyrolysis process is not a pollution control facility under the Act. Defines "post-use polymers" and "pyrolysis". Makes changes to the definition for "municipal waste incineration" in provisions concerning municipal waste incineration emission standards. Limits the concurrent exercise of power by home rule units. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
POLLUTION CONTROL FACILITY
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 013-003-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 22.16b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.336 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.366 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.535 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 47.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 9.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2860&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2860.htm |