IL HB2859 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to survey the various counties of the State to assess the degree of labor surplus on a monthly basis. Requires the Department to give priority to providing grants under its Job Training and Economic Development Grant Program for the purpose of job-training programs in any county or counties which have an unemployment rate in excess of 110% of the U.S. civilian unemployment rate, seasonally adjusted for comparable periods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-JOB TRAINING-UNEMPLOYMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 007-001-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Economic Opportunity Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-415Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback