IL HB2821 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the regulation, licensing, possession, registration, and transportation of components and accessories for handguns by concealed carry licensees are exclusive powers and functions of the State. Provides that any ordinance or regulation, or portion thereof, enacted on or before the effective date of the bill that purports to impose regulations or restrictions on components and accessories for handguns in a manner inconsistent with the Act shall be invalid in its application to licensees under the Act on the effective date of the bill. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY-PREEMPT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-15HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306690Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback