IL HB2814 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Restores certain portions of the oath of office. Adds an immediate effective date.
Title
SCH CD-SCH BOARD-OFFICE OATH
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] |
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-03-17 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 004-000-003 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |