IL HB2802 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Transportation Benefits Program Act. Requires all covered employers to offer at least one transportation benefit program. Provides that the employer may choose between providing a program consistent with federal law that allows employees to elect to exclude from taxable wages and compensation the employee's commuting costs incurred for the purchase of a transit pass to use public transit or for the purchase of qualified parking, or a program under which the employer supplies a transit pass for the particular qualifying public transit requested by the covered employee or reimburses the covered employee for payments made for the use of qualified parking. Defines terms. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
TRANSPORTATION BENEFIT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-054-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Mass Transit Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-04-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mass Transit Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-03-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-15 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-09 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Mass Transit Committee; 007-005-000 |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Mass Transit Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |