IL HB2801 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that the tax imposed on the privilege of operating motor vehicles that use liquefied natural gas or propane is 21.5 cents per gallon. Provides that the tax imposed on compressed natural gas is 19 cents per gallon. Provides that, in the case of liquefied natural gas and propane, "gallon" means a diesel gallon equivalent. Amends the Weights and Measures Act. Provides that liquefied natural gas used as motor fuel shall be sold in diesel gallon equivalents, and compressed natural gas shall be sold in gasoline gallon equivalents. Provides that propane used as motor fuel shall be sold in actual measured gallon volumetric units, subject to adjustment for the purposes of determining the diesel gallon equivalents that are subject to the tax rates under the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Amends the Environmental Impact Fee Law. Provides that no fee is imposed on the importation or receipt of liquefied natural gas (i) sold to or used by a rail carrier or (ii) consumed or used in the operation of ships, barges, or vessels that are used primarily in or for the transportation of property in interstate commerce for hire on rivers bordering Illinois if the natural gas is delivered to the ship, barge, or vessel by a licensed receiver. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOTOR FUEL-MEASUREMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-001-001
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-09HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2254702Amended CodeCitation Text
2254708Amended CodeCitation Text
355051.13CNew CodeSee Bill Text
355051.8Amended CodeCitation Text
355051.8ANew CodeSee Bill Text
355051.8BNew CodeSee Bill Text
355052Amended CodeCitation Text
355052aAmended CodeCitation Text
355055Amended CodeCitation Text
415125310Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback