IL HB2800 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Perinatal HIV Prevention Act. Provides that every health care professional who provides health care services to a pregnant person, unless a pregnant person already has a documented negative HIV status (currently, already been tested) during the third trimester of the current pregnancy (currently, during the current pregnancy) or is already documented to be HIV-positive, shall provide specified HIV counseling and shall test the person for HIV on an opt-out basis (currently, unless she refuses). Adds provisions concerning when opt-out HIV testing and rapid opt-out HIV testing shall occur. Makes changes to provisions concerning specified HIV counseling requirements. Makes changes to provisions concerning reporting, including requiring that a specified report concerning a HIV-positive pregnant or post-partum person or HIV-exposed newborn shall be made by a health care facility to the Department of Public Health's Perinatal HIV Hotline within 12 hours but not later than 24 hours of test results (currently, a health facility shall report within 24 hours after birth if a woman is HIV-positive and the newborn is HIV-exposed). Provides that the provisions of the Act requiring testing for HIV (currently, provisions of the Act) shall not apply when a parent or guardian objects to HIV testing on certain grounds. Defines "birthing center", "opt-out testing", and "third trimester". Changes references from "pregnant woman" to "pregnant person" and makes other similar changes. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERINATAL HIV PREVENTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41033510Amended CodeCitation Text
41033515Amended CodeCitation Text
41033530Amended CodeCitation Text
41033535Amended CodeCitation Text
4103355Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback